(PC) Felix v. Dougherty et al
Plaintiff: Tylo Jerome Felix, Jr.
Defendant: S. Dougherty, E. McDaniels, C. Bell, S. Gates, C. Cazores, J. Smotherman, D. Diaz, Arreazola and A. Velasquez
Case Number: 1:2021cv01472
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SECOND ORDER to pay Filing Fee or submit IFP Application signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/23/2021. 30-Day Deadline. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order served on Tylo Jerome Felix Jr. (Lundstrom, T)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 Order by Tylo Jerome Felix, Jr. (Lundstrom, T)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to submit receipt or payment of filing fee within 21-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/28/2021. (Lundstrom, T)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Lundstrom, T)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Tylo Jerome Felix Jr. (Lundstrom, T)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order of Clarification served on Tylo Jerome Felix Jr.. (Lundstrom, T)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of CDCR # and the Payment of Filing Fee, by Tylo Jerome Felix, Jr.. (Marrujo, C)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:21-01472-NONE-SKO-(PC). (Lundstrom, T)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Tylo Jerome Felix Jr. (Lundstrom, T)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SUBMIT Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Tylo Jerome Felix Jr. (Jessen, A)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Arreazola, A. Velasquez, C. Bell, C. Cazores, D. Diaz, S. Dougherty, S. Gates, E. McDaniels, J. Smotherman by Tylo Jerome Felix, Jr. (Jessen, A)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Tylo Jerome Felix Jr. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Felix v. Dougherty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tylo Jerome Felix, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cazores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Smotherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arreazola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?