Ruiz v. Conduent Commercial Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Lynn Ruiz
Defendant: Conduent Commercial Solutions LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01555
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER #15 to Stay Discovery and Continue Scheduling Conference Pending a Decision on Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/19/2022. Discovery STAYED. Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 9/29/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Hall, S)
April 18, 2022 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE PENDING A DECISION ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Conduent Commercial Solutions LLC. (Hearne, Heather)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 01/25/2022. (Maldonado, C)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the temporary magistrate judge referral, the Scheduling Conference currently set for April 26, 2022 is HEREBY RESET to April 27, 2022 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference in full compliance with the requirements set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference (see attached). The parties shall appear at the conference remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/13/2022. (Valdez, E)
January 11, 2022 Filing 12 REPLY by Conduent Commercial Solutions LLC re #9 Opposition to Motion, #6 Motion to Compel,. (Hearne, Heather)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *Unassigned DJ* to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all further proceedings. Documents filed in this case shall continue to include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(BAM)* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate is appointed. (Gonzalez, R)
January 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(BAM)* (Sant Agata, S)
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 OPPOSITION by Lynn Ruiz to #6 Motion to Compel,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Attorney Patrick D. Martinez in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff in Support of Opposition)(Yadidsion, Danny)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/29/2021: In light of the pending motion to compel arbitration, the Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2022 is CONTINUED to 4/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a joint scheduling report at least one week prior to the conference. (Text Only Entry) (Hall, S)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Conduent Commercial Solutions LLC. (Hearne, Heather)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Conduent Commercial Solutions LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Proposed Order)(Hearne, Heather)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Maldonado, C)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Conduent Commercial Solutions LLC. (Hearne, Heather)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Flores, E)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of ERRATA by Conduent Commercial Solutions LLC re #1 Notice of Removal.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hearne, Heather)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL by Conduent Commercial Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hearne, Heather)
October 21, 2021 RECEIPT number ACAEDC-9885624 for $402.00 for Conduents Commercial Solutions, LLC from Heather Hearne. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Conduent Commercial Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Ruiz
Represented By: Danny Yadidsion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conduent Commercial Solutions LLC
Represented By: Heather Dawn Hearne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?