(PC) Loureiro, Jr. v. Santoro et al
Plaintiff: Ronald W. F. Joshua Loureiro, Jr.
Defendant: K. Santoro, K. Drake, J. Jaime, R. Phillpott, Z. Ellison and A. Magallanes
Case Number: 1:2021cv01599
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/21/2021. Motion for IFP due within THIRTY DAYS. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions Prisoner) (Marrujo, C)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion for Extension, served on Ronald W. F. Joshua Loureiro, Jr.. (Marrujo, C)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to File IFP Application and NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS, by Ronald W. F. Joshua Loureiro, Jr.. (Marrujo, C)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/03/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application Form)(Flores, E)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Ronald W. F. Joshua Loureiro, Jr. (Flores, E)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on North Kern State Prison. (Flores, E)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *11/2/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Flores, E)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against K. Drake, Z. Ellison, J. Jaime, A. Magallanes, R. Phillpott, K. Santoro by Ronald W. F. Joshua Loureiro, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Loureiro, Jr. v. Santoro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald W. F. Joshua Loureiro, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Santoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jaime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Phillpott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Magallanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?