(PC) Spencer v. Smith
Plaintiff: Edward B. Spencer
Defendant: C. Smith
Case Number: 1:2021cv01646
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCREENING ORDER; ORDER for Plaintiff to: (1) FILE a First Amended Complaint; or (2) NOTIFY the Court that he wants to Stand on his Complaint; Thirty (30) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Sant Agata, S)
January 7, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Screening Order, served on Edward B. Spencer. (Sant Agata, S)
November 22, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Flores, E)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Jessen, A)
November 17, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Edward B. Spencer. (Jessen, A)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Edward B. Spencer. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Spencer v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward B. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?