Bissat v. City of Visalia
Plaintiff: Rashid Bissat
Defendant: City of Visalia
Case Number: 1:2021cv01649
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *Unassigned DJ* to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all further proceedings. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to City of Visalia on 1/3/2022, Answer due 3/4/2022 (Herr, Leonard)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Clarification Order, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Visalia* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William A. Romaine* *3323 S. Fairway Street* *Suite 5* *Visalia, CA 93277*. (Sant Agata, S)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Rashid Bissat. Attorney Romaine, William Anthony added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Romaine, William)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number ACAEDC-9924823 paid by William Anthony Romaine fbo Rashid Bissat. (Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bissat v. City of Visalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashid Bissat
Represented By: Zishan Lokhandwala
Represented By: William Anthony Romaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Visalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?