DP Enterprises, LP v. James Corrado, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DP Enterprises, LP
Defendant: James Corrado, Inc., Peter Corrado, Gerald Corrado and Joseph Corrado
Case Number: 1:2021cv01655
Filed: November 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/17/2021. (Kusamura, W)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/17/2021: (Text Only Entry) Before the Court is the Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. (Doc. #14 .) The Court notes that while the proposed order was filed with the ex parte application, Plaintiff did not email an electronic copy of the proposed order to the Court's chambers, as required by Local Rule 137. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the parties to send an electronic version of the proposed order in Microsoft Word format to SKOorders@caed.uscourts.gov by no later than December 20, 2021.(Kusamura, W)
December 16, 2021 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION by DP Enterprises, LP for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint; Order. (Titus, Michael)
December 15, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: James Corrado, Inc. served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Titus, Michael)
December 15, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Gerald Corrado served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (Titus, Michael)
December 15, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Joseph Corrado served on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (Titus, Michael)
December 15, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Peter Corrado served on 11/29/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Titus, Michael)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; and DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/19/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's ex parte application for a temporary restraining order (Doc. Nos. #7 & [7-1]) is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED (Doc. No. [7-2]), without prejudice to renewing the motion with proper notice. (Gonzales, V)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET by DP Enterprises, LP (Titus, Michael)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by DP Enterprises, LP. (Attachments: #1 Motion for TRO, #2 Motion for Preliminary Injuction, #3 P&A in support of TRO and Preliminary Injuction, #4 Dec. of Papagni, #5 Declaration Certification of Counsel, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order TRO, #7 Proposed Order Proposed Order Preliminary Injuction)(Titus, Michael)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Complaint. **Attn: Michael Charles Titus ** Wrong Event Used**You have several filings attached to main document #3 titled "Complaint" however, the actual documents attached are a variety of documents that should be filed using the appropriate events, especially "Motions" and "Proposed Motions". Please re-file all your documents in #3 using the correct events for each document. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to theCM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website., (Martin-Gill, S)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Gerald Corrado, Joseph Corrado, Peter Corrado, James Corrado, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Charles Titus* *Wild Carter & Tipton* *246 W. Shaw Avenue* *Fresno, CA 93704*. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 16, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against James Corrado, Inc. by DP Enterprises, LP. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9928877) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice, #3 Memorandum, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 TRO Proposed Order, #7 Preliminary Injuction Motion, #8 Preliminary Injuction Order)(Titus, Michael)
November 16, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Michael Titus re #1 Complaint: Under Local Rule 200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Sant Agata, S)
November 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by DP Enterprises, LP. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9928870) (Titus, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DP Enterprises, LP v. James Corrado, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DP Enterprises, LP
Represented By: Michael Charles Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Corrado, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Corrado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Corrado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Corrado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?