Williams v. Carrillo et al
Plaintiff: Prince Paul Raymond Williams
Defendant: Bezaleel Carrillo, Javier Rivera, Margaret Mims and Raul Cervantez
Case Number: 1:2021cv01659
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/10/2021.(Rooney, M)
December 10, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Rooney, M)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/18/2021. (Maldonado, C)
November 18, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Maldonado, C)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Jessen, A)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bezaleel Carrillo, Raul Cervantez, Margaret Mims, Javier Rivera by Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jessen, A)
November 17, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Carrillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Paul Raymond Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bezaleel Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Cervantez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?