Williams v. Messa et al
Plaintiff: Prince Paul Raymond Williams
Defendant: Abagail Messa, Amanda Ford, Christina Astorga, Delfino Neira and Justin R. Johnson
Case Number: 1:2021cv01660
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2022. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 4, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (Long Form) by Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Marrujo, C)
December 21, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Marrujo, C)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Long Form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/07/2021. IFP Deadline Due Within Thirty-Days. (Attachments: #1 IFP Long Form Application)(Maldonado, C)
December 7, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Maldonado, C)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Jessen, A)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christina Astorga, Amanda Ford, Justin R. Johnson, Abagail Messa, Delfino Neira by Prince Paul Raymond Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Jessen, A)
November 17, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Messa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Paul Raymond Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abagail Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Astorga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delfino Neira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?