(PC) Goodbar v. Paldara et al
Plaintiff: Robbie Goodbar
Defendant: Paldara, Martin Djoveski and Polder
Case Number: 1:2021cv01811
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Rivera, O)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Robbie Goodbar. (Rivera, O)
January 3, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Robbie Goodbar. (Rivera, O)
December 28, 2021 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Robbie Goodbar, CDC BK1790 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Marrujo, C)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Robbie Goodbar. (Marrujo, C)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Henshaw, R)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:21-cv-2349 JDP) to Fresno (1:21-cv-01811 GSA) signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/23/2021. (Henshaw, R)
December 27, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Robbie Goodbar. (Henshaw, R)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/17/2021*; Consent or Decline due by 1/24/2022 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Huang, H)
December 20, 2021 SERVICE BY E-MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Robbie Goodbar. (Huang, H)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Martin Djoveski, Paldara, Polder by Robbie Goodbar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Goodbar v. Paldara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Goodbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paldara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Djoveski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?