(HC) Carroll v. Warden
Petitioner: Tremayne Carroll
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 1:2021cv01813
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER FINDING AS MOOT #4 Petitioner's Motion To Waive Filing Fee filed 01/06/22. On 12/27/2021, the Court permitted Petitioner to proceed in forma pauperis in this action #2 . The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Text Only Order to Petitioner who is non-CMECF participant. signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 1/11/2022. (Barch-Kuchta, Helena)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, served on Tremayne Carroll. (Flores, E)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Excuse Filing Fee and/or Withdraw Motion 01/02/22 by Tremayne Carroll. (Flores, E)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due within 30 days. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Rivera, O)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Tremayne Carroll, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 12/27/2021. (Rivera, O)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Warden by Tremayne Carroll. (Rivera, O)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL:, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Order Authorizing IFP Status #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Tremayne Carroll. (Rivera, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Carroll v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tremayne Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?