(PC) Suarez v. Clark
Plaintiff: Jose Alfredo Suarez
Defendant: Ken Clark
Case Number: 1:2022cv00160
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCREENING ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT OR NOTIFY THE COURT OF INTENT TO PROCEED ON CLAIMS FOUND TO BE COGNIZABLE, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/25/2022. (Amended Complaint due within 30-Day Deadline) (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Martin-Gill, S)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Screening Order, served on Jose Alfredo Suarez. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/10/2022. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief served on Jose Alfredo Suarez. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration by Jose Alfredo Suarez. (Flores, E)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Flores, E)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/16/2022. (Maldonado, C)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Flores, E)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Jose Alfredo Suarez. (Maldonado, C)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Jose Alfredo Suarez. (Flores, E)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for APPOINTMENT of COUNSEL by Jose Alfredo Suarez. (Maldonado, C)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Jose Alfredo Suarez. (Flores, E)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Corcoran State Prison. (Flores, E)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Jose Alfredo Suarez, CDC H-52800 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Flores, E)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *2/7/2022*; Consent or Decline due by 3/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Flores, E)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jose Alfredo Suarez. (Flores, E)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Ken Clark by Jose Alfredo Suarez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Suarez v. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alfredo Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?