(HC) Cervantes v. Pfeiffer
Petitioner: Carlos Razo Cervantes
Respondent: Christian Pfeiffer, as Acting Warden and Christian Pfeiffer
Case Number: 1:2022cv00175
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Spolin, Aaron)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Petitioner's #3 Motion for Stay, Dismiss Grounds Five and Six and Hold Proceedings in Abeyance signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 02/15/2022. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R within Fourteen-Days. (Flores, E)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-175 DAD-SKO. (Flores, E)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 3/17/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to STAY by Carlos Razo Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spolin, Aaron)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Carlos Razo Cervantes (Spolin, Aaron)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Christian Pfeiffer, as Acting Warden by Carlos Razo Cervantes. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number ACAEDC-10071795) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spolin, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Cervantes v. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Razo Cervantes
Represented By: Aaron Spolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christian Pfeiffer, as Acting Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christian Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?