Groover v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: James Groover
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00347
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re: #33 Stipulation for Plaintiff's Fees, Costs and Expenses, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/27/2023. (Rivera, O)
August 24, 2023 Filing 33 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for PLAINTIFFS FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES and REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER by James Groover. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting Joint Stipulation for Order to continue Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, costs, and expenses and jurisdiction #31 signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/11/2023. Filing Deadline: 8/21/2023. (Lundstrom, T)
July 11, 2023 Filing 31 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION by James Groover. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES AND JURISDICTION)(Dolin, Tionna)
July 6, 2023 Filing 30 JUDGMENT dated *07/05/2023* pursuant to Acceptance of Offer of Judgment.(Gonzalez, R)
July 5, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of ACCEPTANCE with OFFER of JUDGMENT by James Groover. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Judgment)(Dolin, Tionna)
July 5, 2023 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Tionna Dolin re #27 REQUEST for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) by James Groover: The attached document is a Notice of Acceptance of Offer of Judgment and cannot be processed as filed. Please re-file your document using the correct event Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment, which can be found under Civil Events - Other Filings - Notices. For future filings please do not use generic request when a more specific event is available. (Gonzalez, R)
June 30, 2023 Filing 27 ***Disregard, Per Clerk's Notice 28 *** REQUEST for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) by James Groover. (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)(Dolin, Tionna)
January 27, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nino Sanaia on behalf of James Groover. Attorney Sanaia, Nino added. (Sanaia, Nino)
January 12, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF by All Plaintiffs. (Dolin, Tionna)
October 21, 2022 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Brain Vanderhoof re #22 Notice of Change of Address: Due to the recent upgrade in the Eastern District of California to NextGen, all changes to address will need to be made through Pacer. Until you update your address through Pacer, the docket will reflect your previous address. (Maldonado, C)
October 20, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Steven Whang on behalf of James Groover. Attorney Whang, Steven added. (Whang, Steven)
October 20, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Brian Curtis Vanderhoof. (Vanderhoof, Brian)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause (Doc. 18 ). Having considered counsel's response (Doc. #19 ), the Order to Show Cause issued on July 19, 2022, is HEREBY DISCHARGED. No sanctions will be imposed. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/20/2022. (Valdez, E)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/19/2022. Amendment to Pleadings: December 1, 2022; Initial Disclosure: July 29, 2022; Expert Disclosure: April 21, 2023; Supplemental Expert Disclosure: May 12, 2023; Non-expert Discovery Cutoff: March 23, 2023; Expert Discovery Cutoff: June 16, 2023; Pretrial Motion Filing Deadline: August 18, 2023; Pretrial Conference: January 26, 2024, 1:30 p.m., Courtroom 4 (JLT); Jury Trial: March 26, 2024, (3-5 days) 8:30 a.m., Courtroom 4 (JLT). (Marrujo, C)
July 19, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Ariel Harman-Holmes re 18 Minute Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,,. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): ): ORDER to SHOW CAUSE: Counsel for Plaintiff James Groover is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this Court should not impose sanctions for the failure to appear at the Scheduling Conference on July 19, 2022. Counsel shall respond to this Order to Show Cause, in writing, no later than July 25, 2022. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause may result in the imposition of sanctions. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/19/2022. (Rivera, O)
July 19, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/19/2022: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - held. Orders to follow. Plaintiff's Counsel - NO APPEARANCE. Defendant's Counsel Brian Vanderhoof appeared by Zoom video - present. (Rivera, O)
July 12, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by James Groover. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): On June 23, 2022, the Court convened a Scheduling Conference. Due to the parties' inability to meet and confer in advance of the Scheduling Conference, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is CONTINUED to July 19, 2022, at 8:30 AM, in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Prior to the conference, the parties shall meet and confer regarding updated Joint Scheduling Report dates. As directed in the Court's Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference, the parties will be expected to discuss settlement thoroughly before undertaking the preparation of the Joint Scheduling Report. (Doc. #3 at 2.) The parties shall file the Joint Scheduling Report at least one (1) full week prior to the conference. The parties shall appear at the conference remotely with each party connecting either via Zoom video or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/23/2022. (Valdez, E)
June 23, 2022 Filing 14 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via Zoom video before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/23/2022: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - not held. Order to follow. Plaintiff's Counsel: Daniel Law appeared by Zoom video - present. Defendant's Counsel: Brian Vanderhoof appeared by Zoom telephone - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: off the record. (Valdez, E)
June 22, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel Albert Law on behalf of James Groover. Attorney Law, Daniel Albert added. (Law, Daniel)
June 16, 2022 Filing 12 SCHEDULING REPORT by James Groover. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
June 16, 2022 Filing 11 SCHEDULING REPORT by Ford Motor Company. (Vanderhoof, Brian)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties shall appear at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for June 23, 2022, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties shall be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/18/2022. (Valdez, E)
May 10, 2022 Filing 9 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Tionna Dolin for James Groover, attorney Karin Kuemerle terminated (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of James Groover. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 15, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Won, Jonathan)
April 15, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. Attorney Won, Jonathan added.(Won, Jonathan)
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Karin Kuemerle on behalf of James Groover. Attorney Kuemerle, Karin added. (Kuemerle, Karin)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: James Groover served on 3/25/2022, answer due 4/15/2022. (Dolin, Tionna)
March 25, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Flores, E)
March 25, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ford Motor Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tionna Dolin* *Strategic Legal Practices, Apc* *1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Flores, E)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Statutory Obligations against Ford Motor Company by James Groover. Attorney Dolin, Tionna added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10140444) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2017 Ford Car Light Truck Warranty, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groover v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Groover
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Daniel Albert Law
Represented By: Steven Whang
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jonathan Won
Represented By: Brian Curtis Vanderhoof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?