(PC) Fries v. Pfeiffer
Plaintiff: Michael Fries
Defendant: Pfeiffer
Case Number: 1:2022cv00380
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Jessen, A)
May 12, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Michael Fries. (Jessen, A)
May 11, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Michael Fries. (Jessen, A)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Change of Venue signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/11/2022. (Jessen, A)
May 11, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion served on Michael Fries. (Jessen, A)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Review and/or Reconsideration by Michael Fries. (Jessen, A)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SUBMIT Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)
April 18, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Michael Fries. (Jessen, A)
April 1, 2022 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 5/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Flores, E)
April 1, 2022 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:22-cv-02023.
April 1, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Michael Fries. (Flores, E)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/31/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/1/2022.]
March 30, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/1/2022.]
March 30, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 5/9/2022. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/1/2022.]
March 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Warden Pfeiffer. Filed by Michael Fries. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope)(sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2022) [Transferred from cand on 4/1/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Fries v. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?