(PC) Helm v. Madera County et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Curtis Allen Helm
Defendant: Madera County, State of California and Madera County Jail
Case Number: 1:2022cv00423
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis Order on Request served on Jacob Curtis Allen Helm. (Flores, E)
May 20, 2022 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, RTS-Unable to Forward: #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order on Request sent to Jacob Curtis Allen Helm. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 12, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to ATASCADERO STATE HOSPITAL by Jacob Curtis Allen Helm. (Lundstrom, T)
May 12, 2022 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction, #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Jacob Curtis Allen Helm. (Lundstrom, T)
May 10, 2022 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Not in Custody, 8 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction Notice of Change of Address due by 7/18/2022. (Flores, E)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #2 #6 #7 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/2/2022. (Sant Agata, S)
May 2, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Jacob Curtis Allen Helm. (Sant Agata, S)
April 28, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and U.S. Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; the new case number is 1:22-cv-00423 JLT-SKO (PC). (Martin-Gill, S)
April 28, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction served on Jacob Curtis Allen Helm. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 27, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST for Acceptance of #6 In Forma Pauperis due to Lack of Compliance of Defendants on Time Extension by Jacob Curtis Allen Helm. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 27, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jacob Curtis Allen Helm. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to SUBMIT Inmate Trust Statement signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/13/2022. 30-Day Deadline. (Sant Agata, S)
April 14, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on Jacob Curtis Allen Helm. (Sant Agata, S)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 5/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jacob Curtis Allen Helm. (Maldonado, C)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Madera County, Madera County Jail, State of California by Jacob Curtis Allen Helm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, C)
April 12, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jacob Curtis Allen Helm. (Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Helm v. Madera County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Curtis Allen Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?