(SS) Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stacy Ann Wilson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv00429
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING #4 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/06/2022. Thirty-Day Deadline to Pay Filing Fee. (Maldonado, C)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING #5 Motion for 30-Day Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/19/2022. (Hall, S)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to Pay Filing Fee re #4 Findings and Recommendations (Motion),, by Stacy Ann Wilson. (Pena, Jonathan)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees and costs #2 be Denied; Plaintiff be required to pay the $402.00 filing fee in full to proceed with this action re #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Stacy Ann Wilson; new case number is 1:22-cv-00429 DAD-BAK (SS); referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/13/2022. (Objections to F&R due within 14-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(BAM)* (Martin-Gill, S)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Stacy Ann Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Stacy Ann Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Ann Wilson
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?