(PC) Vega v. Soto et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Vega, Jr.
Defendant: M. Soto, Borba and Noujaime
Case Number: 1:2022cv00471
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File a First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/15/2022. Amended Complaint due by 7/13/2022. (Flores, E)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order on Motion for Extension served on Francisco Vega Jr. (Flores, E)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File First Amended Complaint by Francisco Vega, Jr. (Flores, E)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCREENING ORDER for Plaintiff to Notify the Court that he wants to Proceed Only on his First Amended Retaliation Claim Against Defendant Soto, File a First Amended Complaint, or Notify the Court that he wants to Stand on his Complaint; ORDER DENYING #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay the Filing Fee as Moot; ORDER VACATING #8 April 25, 2022 Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/13/2022. First Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty-Days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Maldonado, C)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Screening Order served on Francisco Vega Jr. (Maldonado, C)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to Pay Filing Fee, by Francisco Vega, Jr. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE100050562 $402.00 fbo Francisco Vega, Jr. by Ana Rojas on 5/10/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be denied #2 , #6 . Referred to Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; Objections to F&R's due within 21-Days. ORDER directing Clerk to assign a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/25/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-00471-JLT-EPG-(PC). (Lundstrom, T)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, #8 Findings and Recommendations served on Francisco Vega Jr. (Lundstrom, T)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Francisco Vega, Jr. (Flores, E)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Francisco Vega, Jr, CDC G-18832 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Flores, E)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Francisco Vega, Jr. (Flores, E)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *4/21/2022*. Consent or Decline due by 5/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Flores, E)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Francisco Vega, Jr. (Flores, E)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Borba, Noujaime, M. Soto by Francisco Vega, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Vega v. Soto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Vega, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noujaime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?