(HC)Gramajo Lopez v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Hector Gramajo Lopez
Defendant: Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Wanda Wilson and Polly Kaiser
Case Number: 1:2022cv00531
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Filing 12 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 6/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
May 4, 2022 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:22-cv-02621.
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #9 JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSFER. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022) [Transferred from cand on 5/4/2022.]
May 2, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Transfer Petition to the Eastern District of California filed by Merrick Garland, Polly Kaiser, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/2/2022) [Transferred from cand on 5/4/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hector Gramajo Lopez (Mackins, Mackenzie) (Filed on 4/29/2022) [Transferred from cand on 5/4/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENTS TO RESPOND, SETTING HEARING DATE, DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANTS WITH NOTICE OF ORDER AND FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Response due by 5/5/2022. Reply due by 5/6/2022. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/29/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022) [Transferred from cand on 5/4/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 4/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022) [Transferred from cand on 5/4/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022) [Transferred from cand on 5/4/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/13/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022) [Transferred from cand on 5/4/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Mackins, Mackenzie) (Filed on 4/29/2022) [Transferred from cand on 5/4/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Hector Gramajo Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mackins, Mackenzie) (Filed on 4/29/2022) [Transferred from cand on 5/4/2022.]
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number ACANDC-17131741.). Filed byHector Gramajo Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Exhibit Z, #28 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause, #29 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #30 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Mackins, Mackenzie) (Filed on 4/29/2022) [Transferred from cand on 5/4/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC)Gramajo Lopez v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Gramajo Lopez
Represented By: Mackenzie Mackins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Adrienne Zack, GOVT
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Adrienne Zack, GOVT
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polly Kaiser
Represented By: Adrienne Zack, GOVT
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?