(PC) O'Brien v. Reed et al
Case Number: 1:2022cv00780
Filed: June 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims re 20 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/29/2022. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Rivera, O)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/12/2022. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-Days.(Flores, E)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:22-cv-1007 CKD) to Fresno (1:22-cv-0780 BAM) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/27/22(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) O'Brien v. Reed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?