(HC) Moreno v. Allison
Petitioner: Jesse Moreno
Respondent: Kathleen Allison
Case Number: 1:2022cv00851
Filed: July 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 USCA MANDATE as to #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Jesse Moreno. (Lawrence, A)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #20 Notice of Appeal filed by Jesse Moreno. Notice of Appeal filed *9/6/2022*, Complaint filed *7/11/2022* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *8/26/2022*. Court Reporter: *N/A*. *Fee Status: IFP Granted on 7/11/2022* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Lawrence, A)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #21 Appeal Processed to USCA served on Jesse Moreno. (Lawrence, A)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEAL by Jesse Moreno as to #19 Findings and Recommendations. (Lawrence, A)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's #14 Motion to Stay and Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/26/2022. Referred to Judge Thruston; Objections to F&R due within Thirty-Days. (Flores, E)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #19 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Jesse Moreno. (Flores, E)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 USCA ORDER as to #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Jesse Moreno. This appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. (Lawrence, A)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 USCA CASE NUMBER 22-16172 for #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Jesse Moreno. (Marrujo, C)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Jesse Moreno. Notice of Appeal filed *8/1/2022*, Complaint filed *7/11/2022* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *7/21/2022*. Court Reporter: *N/A*. *Fee Status: IFP Granted on 7/11/2022* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Lawrence, A)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Appeal Processed to USCA served on Jesse Moreno. (Lawrence, A)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of APPEAL by Jesse Moreno as to #13 Order on Motion to Disqualify. (Lawrence, A)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion and Motion for Order to Stay Proceedings (Rhines Stay) by Jesse Moreno. (Lawrence, A)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING #12 Petitioner's Motion for Disqualification signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/21/2022. (Lawrence, A)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order on Motion served on Jesse Moreno. (Lawrence, A)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Peremptory Disqualification and Declaration in Support of Motion by Jesse Moreno. (Lawrence, A)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY): This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-00851-JLT-EPG (HC). (Lawrence, A)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lawrence, A)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 11 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Jesse Moreno. (Lawrence, A)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Petition Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Exhaust State Judicial Rememdies signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/12/2022. Show Cause Response due within Thirty (30) Days.(Sant Agata, S)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order to Show Cause served on Jesse Moreno. (Sant Agata, S)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 8/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Jesse Moreno signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/11/2022. (Sant Agata, S)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:22-cv-03612.
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/11/2022. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)Order mailed to Plaintiff on July 11, 2022. [Transferred from cand on 7/11/2022.]
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #8 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jesse Moreno. (Sant Agata, S)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jesse Moreno. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2022) [Transferred from cand on 7/11/2022.]
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 7/29/2022. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 7/11/2022.]
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jesse Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022) [Transferred from cand on 7/11/2022.]
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Jesse Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022) [Transferred from cand on 7/11/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Moreno v. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesse Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?