Lawrence v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Susan Lawrence
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv00931
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
2 Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/29/2022. Pursuant to the recusal of Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto and reassignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean, the Court sets an Initial Scheduling Conference for 11/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. To participate telephonically, each party is directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. (Rooney, M)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of Recusal, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/28/2022. Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto no longer assigned to case. New Case Number:1:22-cv-00931-AWI-EPG. (Marrujo, C)
July 27, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
July 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION by Costco Wholesale Corporation re #4 Notice - Other, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice of Removal. (Mason, Gregory)
July 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Costco Wholesale Corporation re #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mason, Gregory)
July 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno Superior Court, case number 22CECG00793 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10350122) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mason, Gregory)
July 27, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Mason, Gregory)
July 27, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Mason, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Lawrence
Represented By: Corina Michelle Burchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Scott Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?