Ali v. American Airlines Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hussein Ali
Defendant: American Airlines Group, Inc. Doing business as American Airlines
Case Number: 1:2022cv01125
Filed: September 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Filing 13 REPLY by American Airlines Group, Inc. re #12 Objections. (Kustic, Sarena)
October 17, 2022 Filing 12 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Hussein Ali to #8 MOTION to DISMISS. (Marrujo, C)
October 14, 2022 Filing 11 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by American Airlines Group, Inc. to #8 Motion to Dismiss. (Kustic, Sarena)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 9/21/2022: (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to the undersigned's standing order and Local Rule 230(g), the recently filed Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 8] will be decided on the papers. No hearing will be calendared. Local Rule 230, as revised March 1, 2022, will govern the filing of oppositions and replies. The parties are further advised that due to the judicial resource emergency and COVID pandemic, there are more than 130 motions currently under submission in Judge de Alba's recently re-assigned caseload. The Court understands the impact that such a backlog has on the parties and is working to resolve all pending motions expeditiously. Unfortunately, despite all diligent efforts, it may still be months before the parties' pending motion is resolved. The Court appreciates your continued patience and reminds the parties that Magistrate Judge consent may alleviate some of the delays caused by the resource emergency.(Hernandez, M)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/21/2022: As a Motion to Dismiss has been noticed for hearing before the District Judge on 10/31/2022, document #8 , the Court vacates the Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2023 before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Within ten days after the issuance of the ruling on the Motion to Dismiss, should the matter go forward, the parties are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Michelle Rooney (mrooney@caed.uscourts.gov) to secure a new scheduling conference date. (Text Only Entry)(Rooney, M)
September 21, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Minute Order served on Hussein Ali. (Rooney, M)
September 21, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Minute Order issued on 9/21/2022 served on Hussein Ali. (Hernandez, M)
September 20, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by American Airlines Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Ana de Alba. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick Kearns)(Kearns, Patrick)
September 13, 2022 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS to Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Hussein Ali. (Flores, E)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 9/13/2022: (Text Only Entry) On September 2, 2022, defendant filed a #1 petition to remove this action to federal court on the basis of diversity jurisdiction. On September 9, 2022, defendant filed a #5 motion to dismiss plaintiff's claim for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Pursuant to Judge de Alba's Standing Order in Civil Actions, counsel must meet and confer prior to filing any motions. (See E.D. Cal. S.O. J. de Alba at 2.) The moving party must further include in its motion "a declaration that the parties exhausted meet and confer efforts, with a very brief summary of said efforts." (Id.) The #5 motion to dismiss does not contain a declaration regarding efforts to meet and confer. Therefore, the motion is denied without prejudice. If, after meeting and conferring, defendant still wishes to file a motion to dismiss, that motion shall be filed no later than five (5) court days following the date of signature on this order. The parties are advised to first consult Local Rule 230 and Judge de Alba's Standing Order in Civil Actions, which can be found at# https://www.caed.uscourts.gov/caednew/assets/File/ADA%20Standing%20Order% 2008242022.pdf (Hernandez, M)
September 13, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Minute Order issued 9/13/2022 served on Hussein Ali. (Hernandez, M)
September 9, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS by American Airlines Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Ana de Alba. (Kearns, Patrick)
September 6, 2022 Filing 4 EXHIBIT A by American Airlines Group, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Kearns, Patrick)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on September 6, 2022, directing defendant to file the attachments missing from the notice of removal. (Rooney, M)
September 6, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Hussein Ali. (Rooney, M)
September 2, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Informational Order) (Lawrence, A)
September 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno Superior Court, case number 22CECG02092 by American Airlines Group, Inc., dba American Airlines. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10421416) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure Statement, #3 Jury Demand)(Kearns, Patrick)
September 2, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Civil New Case Documents for ADA served on Hussein Ali. (Lawrence, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. American Airlines Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hussein Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group, Inc. Doing business as American Airlines
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Kearns
Represented By: Sarena Kustic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?