(HC) Gray v. The People
Petitioner: Thomas Eugene Gray
Respondent: The People
Case Number: 1:2022cv01284
Filed: October 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE re #6 Objections to #5 Findings and Recommendations, by Thomas Eugene Gray. (Marrujo, C)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT dated *11/21/2022* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/21/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING Findings and Recommendations denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, directing Clerk of Court to close case and declining to issue Certificate of Appealability #1 , #5 signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/21/2022. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Judgment, #7 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Thomas Eugene Gray. (Lundstrom, T)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OBJECTION to #5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Petitioner Thomas Eugene Gray. (Rivera, O)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Petition for Lack of Jurisdiction; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign Case to District Judge, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 10/24/2022. Referred to Judge Thurston. Objections to F&R due Within Fourteen-Days. (Maldonado, C)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-01284-JLT-HBK. (Maldonado, C)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), 4 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Thomas Eugene Gray. (Maldonado, C)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Standing Order issued re Petition filed on *10/7/2022* *(Doc. No. 1).* Consent or Decline due by 11/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 Standing Order) (Lundstrom, T)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Thomas Gray signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 10/11/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Thomas Eugene Gray. (Lundstrom, T)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Certioari against The People by Thomas Eugene Gray.(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Gray v. The People
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Eugene Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The People
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?