(PC) Lamon v. McTaggart et al
Plaintiff: Barry Louis Lamon
Defendant: K. McTaggart, D. Laughlin, J. Filippello, N. Lamb, D. Tillery, J. Feltner, J. Walters, J. Bordewick, Z. Warren, J. Marquina, J. Pierce, D. Crozier, J. Sunderland, C. Jimenez, M. Besson, P. J. Covello, D. Webb, B. Holmes, S. Medina, K. Pinelli, I. Salinovich and California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 1:2022cv01421
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-1421-JLT-BAM. (Marrujo, C)
December 23, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Barry Louis Lamon. (Marrujo, C)
December 22, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Marrujo, C)
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand This Action to State Court by Barry Louis Lamon. (Marrujo, C)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Removal of Case to Federal Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/18/2022. (Case Management Deadline: 1/6/2023)(Martin-Gill, S)
November 18, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on Barry Louis Lamon. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 16, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to File Opposition to Removal of Case to the Federal Court by Barry Louis Lamon. (Maldonado, C)
November 14, 2022 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Insufficient Address: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider sent to Robert Andres Bonta at 710 Sansome Street, San Francisco, CA 94111. (Maldonado, C)
November 4, 2022 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 12/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
November 4, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Robert Andres Bonta, Barry Louis Lamon. (Maldonado, C)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kings County Superior Court, case number 20C0376 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10531939) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thai, Quyen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Lamon v. McTaggart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Louis Lamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. McTaggart
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Laughlin
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Filippello
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Lamb
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Tillery
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Feltner
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Walters
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bordewick
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z. Warren
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Marquina
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Pierce
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Crozier
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Sunderland
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Jimenez
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Besson
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. J. Covello
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Webb
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Holmes
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Medina
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Pinelli
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Salinovich
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Giam M. Nguyen
Represented By: Robert Andres Bonta
Represented By: Quyen Vu Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?