(SS) Brooks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kristian O. Brooks
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv01456
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Edwards, L.)
November 28, 2022 Filing 10 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney L. Jamala Edwards for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Social Security Admin- SS E-Service and US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service terminated (Edwards, L.)
November 17, 2022 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE: In accordance with the Social Security Scheduling Order in effect for cases filed on or after June 15, 2021, Defendant Commissioner of Social Security hereby acknowledges electronic service of the complaint through the Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel's designated email address on 11/17/2022. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Social Security Admin- SS E-Service, )
November 16, 2022 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Ana de Alba and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-01456-ADA-SAB(SS). (Sant Agata, S)
November 15, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sackett, Harvey)
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #4 Summons, #1 Social Security Complaint, #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider served on Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to E-Service Agreement. (Sant Agata, S)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 2/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Sant Agata, S)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Harvey Peter Sackett* *1055 Lincoln Ave.* *San Jose, CA 95125*. (Sant Agata, S)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/2022. (Sant Agata, S)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kristian O. Brooks. (Sackett, Harvey)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT For Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Commissioner of Social Security by Kristian O. Brooks. Attorney Sackett, Harvey Peter added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sackett, Harvey)
November 10, 2022 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Brooks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristian O. Brooks
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: L. Jamala Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?