(PC) Roberts v. Kern Valley State Prison et al
Case Number: 1:2022cv01505
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a United States District Judge to this Case; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g) be Revoked, and Plaintiff be Required to Pay the $402.00 Filing Fee in Full within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/04/2023. Referred to Judge de Alba; Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-Days. (Flores, E)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not be Dismissed as Barred by Statute of Limitations, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/28/2022. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Rivera, O)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:22-cv-1596 DMC PC) to Fresno (1:22-cv-1505 GSA PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/18/2022. (Yin, K) Modified on 11/21/2022 (Yin, K).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Roberts v. Kern Valley State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?