(PC) Matthews v. Ramos et al
Case Number: 1:2022cv01508
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER directing Clerk of Court to close case pursuant to Parties' Stipulation for voluntary dismissal 55 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/20/2024. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that inmate Gene Raymond Matthews, III is no longer needed as a witness in these proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 6/5/2024. (Lundstrom, T)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Produce Inmate Gene Raymond Matthews, III, CDCR BP-7876 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/3/2024. Inmate to appear in person before a Magistrate Judge on June 3, 2024, at 8:30 a.m. at the CSP-COR, 4001 King Avenue, Corcoran, CA 93212. (Marrujo, C)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING 48 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Reset Pending Deadlines and Stay Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/21/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/2/2024. Defendants' Opposition to MSJ due by 8/2/2024. (Lawrence, A)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/18/2024. Settlement Conference set for 6/3/2024 at 08:30 AM at CSP Corcoran before a Magistrate Judge . (Lawrence, A)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 39 Defendants' Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/22/2024. Discovery and Motion to Compel Deadline: 3/12/2024. Dispositive Motions Deadline: 5/22/2024. (Maldonado, C)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING 31 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/26/2023. (Rivera, O)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING 32 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/24/2023. (Rivera, O)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Recommending Plaintiff's Request for Injunctive Relief be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/21/2023. Referred to Judge Thurston. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-Days. (Maldonado, C)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference, LIFTING Stay of Case, and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Issue the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/12/2023. The settlement conference set for 7/13/2023 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe is VACATED. (Rivera, O)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING Case to Post-Screening ADR and STAYING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/11/2023. Settlement Conference (Zoom) set for 7/13/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Sant Agata, S)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a District Judge to This Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/3/2023. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN DAYS. (Marrujo, C)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel, Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/22/2022. (Lawrence, A)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:22-cv-1633 WBS DMC PC) to Fresno (1:22-cv-1508 SAB PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/18/2022. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Matthews v. Ramos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?