(SS) Alvarez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Blanca Esthela Alvarez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv01576
Filed: December 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:22-cv-1576 JLT-EPG. (Flores, E)
January 4, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benavides, Francesco)
January 4, 2023 Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #4 Summons, #1 Social Security Complaint, #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider served on Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to E-Service Agreement. (Flores, E)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 4/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Flores, E)
January 4, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Francesco Paulo Benavides* *Law Offices of Francesco Benavides* *1990 N. California Blvd., Suite 20, PMB 1038* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596*. (Flores, E)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/04/2023. (Flores, E)
January 3, 2023 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Flores, E)
December 7, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Blanca Esthela Alvarez. (Benavides, Francesco)
December 7, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Blanca Esthela Alvarez. Attorney Benavides, Francesco Paulo added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benavides, Francesco)
December 7, 2022 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Alvarez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Esthela Alvarez
Represented By: Francesco Paulo Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?