United States v. Approximately $153,292.68 seized from TD Ameritrade account number 871186505 et al
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Approximately $153,292.68 seized from TD Ameritrade account number 871186505, Approximately $50,000.00 seized from TD Ameritrade account number 871186505, Approximately $110,650.00 seized from E*Trade account number XXXXXX9720, Approximately $3,091.85 seized from E*Trade account number XXX-X1621, Approximately $4,536.19 seized from JPMorgan Chase account number 586170398, Approximately $78,094.91 seized from Wells Fargo Bank account number 1678973486, Approximately 192945.439 in U.S. Dollar Coin seized from BlockFi Trading, Approximately 134297.6 Gemini Dollars seized from BlockFi Trading, Approximately 10.61 Ethereum seized from Coinbase Inc., Approximately 0.05488792 Bitcoin seized from BlockFi Trading and Approximately 2.04560196 Bitcoin seized from Coinbase Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022mc00159
Filed: October 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Filing a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/7/2022. (Filing Deadline: 1/13/2023). (Lundstrom, T)
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Filing a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture by United States. (Berg, Alyson)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING A COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE AND/OR TO OBTAIN AN INDICTMENT ALLEGING FORFEITURE, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/31/2022. (Case Management Deadline: 12/9/2022)(Martin-Gill, S)
October 28, 2022 Filing 1 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Filing a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture by United States. Attorney Berg, Alyson A. added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berg, Alyson)
October 28, 2022 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED Forfeiture. (Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Approximately $153,292.68 seized from TD Ameritrade account number 871186505 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Alyson A. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $153,292.68 seized from TD Ameritrade account number 871186505
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $50,000.00 seized from TD Ameritrade account number 871186505
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $110,650.00 seized from E*Trade account number XXXXXX9720
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $3,091.85 seized from E*Trade account number XXX-X1621
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $4,536.19 seized from JPMorgan Chase account number 586170398
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $78,094.91 seized from Wells Fargo Bank account number 1678973486
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 192945.439 in U.S. Dollar Coin seized from BlockFi Trading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 134297.6 Gemini Dollars seized from BlockFi Trading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 10.61 Ethereum seized from Coinbase Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 0.05488792 Bitcoin seized from BlockFi Trading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately 2.04560196 Bitcoin seized from Coinbase Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?