Argus Capital Management LLC v. The Grounds Guys SPV, LLC
Plaintiff: Argus Capital Management LLC
Defendant: The Grounds Guys SPV, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00043
Filed: January 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties shall appear at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for April 11, 2023, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties shall be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/6/2023. (Valdez, E)
February 23, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to The Grounds Guys SPV, LLC on 1/13/2023, Answer due 3/14/2023 (Luther, Douglas)
January 10, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
January 10, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *The Grounds Guys SPV, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Douglas R. Luther* *Luther Firm PC* *4685 MacArthur Court, Suite 440* *Newport Beach, CA 92660*. (Marrujo, C)
January 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs by Argus Capital Management LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10635363) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Statement Disclosure Statement)(Luther, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argus Capital Management LLC v. The Grounds Guys SPV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argus Capital Management LLC
Represented By: Douglas R. Luther
Represented By: Beverly Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Grounds Guys SPV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?