(PC)Montgomery v. CDCR Corrections Officer et al
Plaintiff: Pauline Montgomery
Defendant: CDCR Corrections Officer and Madera County Sheriff
Case Number: 1:2023cv00439
Filed: March 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STRIKING #7 Unsigned Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/10/2023. Plaintiff's Signed Complaint and Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due by 6/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 1983 Complaint Form). (Lawrence, A)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Pauline Montgomery. (Lawrence, A)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 *STRICKEN PER ORDER #8 * MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME by Pauline Montgomery. (Marrujo, C)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CCWF, P.O. Box 1508, Chowchilla, CA 93610 by Pauline Montgomery. (Maldonado, C)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, #3 Order served on Pauline Montgomery. (Maldonado, C)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Undeliverable as Addressed: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case sent to Pauline Montgomery at Madera County Jail, 14191 Road 28, Madera, CA 93638. Notice of Change of Address due by 7/3/2023. (Maldonado, C)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Ana de Alba and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-00439-ADA-BAM (PC). (Rivera, O)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: (5) Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Pauline Montgomery. (Rivera, O)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER STRIKING Unsigned #1 Complaint and REQUIRING Plaintiff to File a Signed Complaint; ORDER TO SUBMIT Prisoner Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/24/2023. Forty-Five (45) Day Deadline. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form, #2 IFP Application)(Sant Agata, S)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 4/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Pauline Montgomery. (Sant Agata, S)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Pauline Montgomery. (Sant Agata, S)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Pauline Montgomery.(Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Montgomery v. CDCR Corrections Officer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR Corrections Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madera County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?