(PC) Jackson v. Shirley, et al.
Plaintiff: Aaron Jackson
Defendant: Heather Shirley, J Cronjager and Scott Degough
Case Number: 1:2023cv00509
Filed: April 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2023 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Aaron Jackson. (Flores, E)
May 30, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Aaron Jackson, CDCR No. BU-0945 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Maldonado, C)
May 30, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Aaron Jackson. (Maldonado, C)
May 30, 2023 Filing 3 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Aaron Jackson.(Maldonado, C)
April 5, 2023 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 5/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER to sever action; ORDER to strike unsigned Complaint #1 ; ORDER to submit signed Complaints and Applications to proceed In Forma Pauperis or pay filing fee within 45-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/4/2023. Charles Miller, Terrence Dunson and Michael Greene terminated. 45-Day Filing Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form, #2 IFP Application)(Lundstrom, T)
April 5, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Order, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Aaron Jackson. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Jackson v. Shirley, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Cronjager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Degough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?