(PC) King v. Allison et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Allen King
Defendant: Kathleen Allison, Brian Gates, E. Barthelemes, R. Hunley, K. Mumby, Chelsea Patricio, C. Bonilla, T. Burns, J. Ramirez and G. Sanchez
Case Number: 1:2023cv00681
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING #12 Motion to Appoint Counsel; ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Amend Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/22/2023. (Marrujo, C)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/22/2023. Objections to F&R due within FOURTEEN DAYS. (Marrujo, C)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-00681-JLT-BAM. (Marrujo, C)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #17 Order, #16 Findings and Recommendations, 15 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Terrance Allen King. (Marrujo, C)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Terrance A. King in support of #12 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Lundstrom, T)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and/or PROTECTIVE ORDER by Terrance Allen King. (Lundstrom, T)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Terrance Allen King. (Lundstrom, T)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Kathleen Allison, E. Barthelemes, C. Bonilla, T. Burns, Brian Gates, R. Hunley, K. Mumby, Chelsea Patricio, J. Ramirez, G. Sanchez by Terrance Allen King.(Lundstrom, T)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Marrujo, C)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Terrance Allen King. (Marrujo, C)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *4/21/2023*. Consent or Decline due by 6/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Spichka, K.)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/03/2023 TRANSFERRING CASE to the Fresno Division. New Case Number 1:23-cv-0681 BAM (PC). Old Case Number 2:23-cv-0762 AC (PC). (Spichka, K.)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order and #8 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Terrance Allen King. (Spichka, K.)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rodriguez, E)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT as to Terrance Allen King. (Reader, L)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Terrance Allen King, CDCR No. AP-8798, to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Huang, H)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Terrance Allen King. (Vij, M)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *4/21/2023*. Consent or Decline due by 5/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Vij, M)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Terrance Allen King. (Vij, M)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Terrance Allen King. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vij, M) Modified on 4/26/2023 (Huang, H).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) King v. Allison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Allen King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Barthelemes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hunley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Mumby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Patricio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?