(PC) Segura v. Sgt. Maldonado et al
Plaintiff: Omar Segura
Defendant: Sgt. Maldonado, Officer Cohello and Officer K. Madrigal
Case Number: 1:2023cv00780
Filed: May 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCREENING ORDER granting Plaintiff leave to file amending complaint or notify Court of willingness to proceed on cognizable claim #1 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/12/2023. Amended Complaint due within 30-Days. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Form). (Lundstrom, T)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Screening Order served on Omar Segura. (Lundstrom, T)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/23/2023. attachment(s) : #1 IFP Motion) (Maldonado, C)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Corcorn State Prison for Omar Segura. (Maldonado, C)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *5/22/2023*. Consent or Decline due by 6/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Maldonado, C)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Omar Segura. (Maldonado, C)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Officer Cohello, Officer K. Madrigal, Sgt. Maldonado by Omar Segura. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Segura v. Sgt. Maldonado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cohello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer K. Madrigal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?