Hussein v. American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ali Hussein and Hussein Ali
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00850
Filed: June 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
2 Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant's #5 Motion to Dismiss be Granted; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Change Plaintiff's Name to "Hussein Ali" on the Docket signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/28/2023. Referred to Judge Ana de Alba. Objections to F&R due within Twenty-One Days. (Sant Agata, S)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Hussein Ali. (Sant Agata, S)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 6/26/2023: (Text Only Entry) The pending #5 motion to dismiss is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for the preparation of findings and recommendations and/or other appropriate action. Accordingly, the noticed hearing date of July 28, 2023 is vacated, and the Court will leave it to the discretion of the assigned Magistrate Judge to set a new hearing date, if necessary. Local Rule 230, as revised March 1, 2022, will govern the filing of oppositions and replies.(Hernandez, M)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 15 Minute Order,, served on Ali Hussein. (Hernandez, M)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY by American Airlines, Inc. re #11 Opposition to Motion, #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Kustic, Sarena)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on June 21, 2023: As Defendants have filed a motion to dismiss (ECF No. #5 ), the scheduling conference noticed for December 19, 2023, before by previously-assigned Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, is vacated. The Court will not reset the scheduling conference at this time. (ECF No. 9 ). Within ten days after the issuance of the ruling on the motion to dismiss, should the matter go forward, the parties are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Michelle Rooney (mrooney@caed.uscourts.gov) to secure a new scheduling conference date. (Text Only Entry)(Rooney, M)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 13 Minute Order served on Ali Hussein. (Rooney, M)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 06/15/2023. Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 1:23-cv-00850-ADA-EPG.(Maldonado, C)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order Reassigning Case, served on Ali Hussein. (Maldonado, C)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OBJECTION by Ali Hussein to #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Xiong, J.)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Ana de Alba and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-00850-ADA-SKO. (Maldonado, C)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/13/2023: (Text Only Entry) Due to the status of the case, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to assign a district judge to this case. Furthermore, the Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby RESET for December 19, 2023, at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Navarro, F)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Ali Hussein. (Maldonado, C)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Minute Order, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings, served on Ali Hussein. (Navarro, F)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:22-cv-01125-ADA-EPG, 1:23-cv-00480-SKO by American Airlines, Inc.. (Kearns, Patrick)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kearns, Patrick)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Recusal signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/12/2023. (Lundstrom, T)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Ali Hussein. (Lundstrom, T)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS by American Airlines, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarena Kustic)(Kustic, Sarena)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2023 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A(m), #2 Consent Form, #3 Informational Order) (Flores, E)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider, served on Ali Hussein. (Flores, E)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by American Airlines Group, Inc.. (Kearns, Patrick)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant American Airlines Group, Inc.. (Kearns, Patrick)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno Superior Court, case number 23CECG01411 by Ali Hussein. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10892652) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kearns, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussein v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Hussein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hussein Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Sarena Kustic
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?