(PC) Rabb v. Cabrera et al
Plaintiff: Damen D. Rabb
Defendant: D. Cabrera and M. Gonzales
Case Number: 1:2023cv01014
Filed: July 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ana de Alba
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/29/2023. Referred to Judge Ana de Alba. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Ana de Alba and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-01014-ADA-BAM(PC). (Sant Agata, S)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), 11 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Damen D. Rabb. (Sant Agata, S)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Damen D. Rabb.(Xiong, J.)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Kern Valley State Prison at 3000 W Cecil Ave, Delano, CA 93216 by Damen D. Rabb. (Marrujo, C)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Screening Order, served on Damen D. Rabb. (Marrujo, C)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/7/2023. First Amended Complaint or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form) (Rivera, O)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Screening Order served on Damen D. Rabb. (Rivera, O)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Xiong, J.)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Damen D. Rabb. (Xiong, J.)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Damen D. Rabb. (Xiong, J.)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis OR Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP App & Instructions.Prisoner) (Marrujo, C)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Damen D. Rabb. (Marrujo, C)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on California Correctional Institution. (Lawrence, A)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *7/6/2023*. Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Lawrence, A)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Damen D. Rabb. (Lawrence, A)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against D. Cabrera, M. Gonzales by Damen D. Rabb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lawrence, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Rabb v. Cabrera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damen D. Rabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?