(SS) Mcguire v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shannon Denise Mcguire
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2023cv01317
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only), signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/29/2023: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 1:23-cv-01317-SAB. (Rivera, O)
September 28, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Gulseth, Geralyn)
September 28, 2023 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Geralyn A Gulseth for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Social Security Admin- SS E-Service and US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service terminated (Gulseth, Geralyn)
September 7, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rosales, Steven)
September 7, 2023 Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #4 Summons, #5 Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider, #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Social Security Complaint, served on AUSA and Commissioner of Social Security. (Maldonado, C)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
September 7, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Steven Gilbert Rosales* *12631 East Imperial Highway* *Suite C-115* *Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670*. (Maldonado, C)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directing Clerk of Court to Issue Summons and Serve Defendant Under E-Service Program, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/07/2023. (Maldonado, C)
September 6, 2023 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Xiong, J.)
September 5, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Shannon Denise Mcguire. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosales, Steven)
September 5, 2023 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT For Review Of Final Decision Of The Commissioner Of Social Security against Commissioner of Social Security by Shannon Denise Mcguire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification of interested parties)(Rosales, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Mcguire v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Denise Mcguire
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Geralyn A Gulseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?