(SS) Delgado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Linda Delgado
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2023cv01404
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Filing 11 JUDGMENT dated *11/15/2023* pursuant to #10 order. (Rivera, O)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: #9 Stipulation for Voluntary Remand Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 405(g), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/15/2023. CASE CLOSED. (Rivera, O)
November 15, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for REMAND TO SSA by Commissioner of Social Security. (Becia, Franco)
October 19, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
October 16, 2023 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Franco Becia for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Social Security Admin- SS E-Service and US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service terminated (Becia, Franco)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/28/2023. Added attorney Maren Miller Bam for Linda Delgado. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Maldonado, C)
September 27, 2023 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Linda Delgado for attorney Maren Miller Bam to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-11098790) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Pena, Jonathan)
September 27, 2023 Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider, #1 Social Security Complaint, #2 Summons served on AUSA and Commissioner of Social Security. (Maldonado, C)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 12/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
September 27, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *2440 Tulare St.* *Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Maldonado, C)
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Linda Delgado. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11097744) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Delgado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Delgado
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Represented By: Maren Miller Bam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Franco Becia, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?