(PC) Porter v. Hamman
Plaintiff: Kevin Lamar Porter
Defendant: Vivian Hamman
Case Number: 1:2023cv01468
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint or Notify the Court of Intent to Proceed on Claims Found to be Cognizable signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/22/2023. Amended Complaint due within Thirty-Days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Flores, E)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Screening Order, served on Kevin Lamar Porter. (Flores, E)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Rivera, O)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Kevin Lamar Porter. (Rivera, O)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 11/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Spichka, K.)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/12/2023 TRANSFERRING CASE to the Fresno Division. New Case Number 1:23-cv-1468 SAB (PC). Old Case Number 2:23-cv-2257 JDP (PC). (Spichka, K.)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kevin Lamar Porter. (Spichka, K.)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 11/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Nair, C)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kevin Lamar Porter. (Nair, C)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kevin Lamar Porter. (Nair, C)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Vivian Hamman by Kevin Lamar Porter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Nair, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Porter v. Hamman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lamar Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Hamman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?