Bowers v. City of Porterville et al
Plaintiff: Mark K. Bowers
Defendant: City of Porterville, Porterville Police Department, Jared Skiles, Richard Standridge, State of California, Tulare County District Attorney's Office Porterville Branch, Alexander Cho, Jonathan Juanez, Ariana Luna and Jesus Luna, III
Case Number: 1:2023cv01483
Filed: October 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: No District Court Judge
Referring Judge: Ana de Alba
2 Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the elevation of U.S. District Judge Ana I. de Alba to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, the court finds it necessary to temporarily reassign this case to No District Court Judge (NODJ) until a new district judge is appointed. (Nguyen, J)
December 1, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Reassigning No District Court Judge, served on Mark K. Bowers. (Nguyen, J)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/07/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #4 ) is GRANTED. Service shall not be undertaken until the Court screens the complaint in due course and issues its screening order. (Nguyen, J)
November 7, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Mark K. Bowers. (Nguyen, J)
November 6, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Mark K. Bowers. (Marrujo, C)
October 24, 2023 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, and Application to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Mark K. Bowers. (Gonzalez, R)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE LONG FORM APPLICATION, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/19/2023. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to forward an in forma pauperis application (Long Form) to Plaintiff. Within thirty (30) days of issuance of this order, Plaintiff shall either (1) pay the $402.00 filing fee for this action, or (2) file a long form application to proceed in forma pauperis without prepayment of the fee. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, this action shall be dismissed. (Nguyen, J) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2023: #1 IFP Application) (Gonzalez, R).
October 20, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Mark K. Bowers. (Nguyen, J)
October 18, 2023 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Maldonado, C)
October 17, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Mark K. Bowers. (Maldonado, C)
October 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexander Cho, City of Porterville, Jonathan Juanez, Ariana Luna, Jesus Luna, III, Porterville Police Department, Jared Skiles, Richard Standridge, State of California, Tulare County District Attorney's Office Porterville Branch by Mark K. Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. City of Porterville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark K. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Porterville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porterville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Skiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Standridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulare County District Attorney's Office Porterville Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Juanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariana Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Luna, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?