Nepinsky v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Nepinsky
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, Pruco Life Insurance Company and Pruco Life Insurance Company of New Jersey
Case Number: 1:2023cv01571
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sample, Rene')
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties shall submit their Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms at least one full week prior to the Scheduling Conference if they have not already done so. The forms should not be transmitted to the assigned magistrate judge. There is no obligation to consent, and the parties may consent or withhold consent without any adverse consequences. Further, the judges will be informed of a party's designation only if all parties have consented. If any party requests reassignment to a District Judge, then the Clerk of the Court will randomly assign a District Judge as presiding judge. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2023. (Valdez, E)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): On November 7, 2023, Defendants removed the action this Court on the basis of diversity jurisdiction. (Doc. #1 .) Defendants also applied for relief pursuant to Local Rule 134(c)(1) to obtain an order deeming the notice of removal filed as of November 6, 2023, due to a technical failure of the CM/ECF system. (Doc. #4 .) Local Rule 134(c)(1) governs untimely filings due to a CM/ECF failure. In relevant part, the rule provides that if a technical failure is not announced on the Court's website, then the party must file the document as promptly as possible and seek appropriate relief from the Court. L.R. 134(c)(1). On December 19, 2023, the Court held a hearing on defendants' application for relief. As stated on the record, there was neither a technical failure of the CM/ECF system for November 6, 2023, announced on the Court's website nor one identified following an internal investigation by the Court. Accordingly, defendants' application for relief (Doc. 4) is DENIED. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2023. (Valdez, E)
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2023: APPLICATION for RELIEF HEARING held. Order to follow. Plaintiff's Counsel: Paul O'Rourke - present via Zoom. Defendants' Counsel: Anne Waddell and Adrienne Hankins - present via Zoom. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Corina Lopez Amador. (Valdez, E)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on Joint Stipulation for Continuance, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/04/2023. Motion Hearing continued to 12/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Maldonado, C)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance re 7 Minute Order,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,,, by Pruco Life Insurance Company, Pruco Life Insurance Company of New Jersey, Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Azarmi, Andrew)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on November 30, 2023. (Munoz, I)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-01571-JLT-BAM. (Maldonado, C)
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Azarmi, Andrew)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Having conducted a preliminary review of Defendants' application for relief due to CM/ECF technical failure (Doc. #4 ), the Court finds it necessary and appropriate to hear oral argument. Accordingly, a hearing on Defendants' application for relief is set for December 6, 2023, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Defendants should be prepared to address their assertion of an unexpected technical failure of the CM/ECF system. The parties shall appear at the hearing remotely with each party connecting either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/15/2023. (Valdez, E)
November 13, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Pruco Life Insurance Company, Pruco Life Insurance Company of New Jersey, Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Azarmi, Andrew)
November 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal of a Civil Action by All Defendants. (Azarmi, Andrew)
November 7, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Relief Due to CM/ECF Technical Failure (L.R. 134) re #1 Notice of Removal, by Pruco Life Insurance Company, Pruco Life Insurance Company of New Jersey, Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Azarmi, Andrew)
November 7, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Pruco Life Insurance Company, Pruco Life Insurance Company of New Jersey, Prudential Insurance Company of America re #2 Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider. (Azarmi, Andrew)
November 7, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A(m), #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
November 7, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court for the County of Tulare, case number VCU302224 by Valerie Nepinsky. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Proof of Service)(Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11170291) (Azarmi, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nepinsky v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Nepinsky
Represented By: Paul J. O'Rourke, Jr.
Represented By: Rene' Lee Sample
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Waddell
Represented By: Andrew Sasan Azarmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pruco Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Sasan Azarmi
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pruco Life Insurance Company of New Jersey
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Waddell
Represented By: Andrew Sasan Azarmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?