Branco v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lawrence Branco
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv01623
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: No District Court Judge
Referring Judge: Ana de Alba
2 Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on January 12, 2024, as follows: 1. The initial scheduling conference set for January 18, 2024, is continued to February 20, 2024, at 11 a.m. The parties are permitted to appear telephonically and may do so by dialing 1-888-251-2909 and entering access code 1024453. The parties are reminded to file a joint scheduling report at least seven days before the conference. (ECF No. #2 , p. 2). 2. The parties' deadline to submit their initial disclosures is extended to February 8, 2024. (Rooney, M)
January 11, 2024 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference and to Extend Deadline to Submit Initial Disclosures by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Alberts, Ronald)
December 6, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Alberts, Ronald)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the elevation of U.S. District Judge Ana I. de Alba to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, the court finds it necessary to temporarily reassign this case to No District Court Judge (NODJ) until a new district judge is appointed. (Lopez Amador, Corina)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE CONFIRMING NOTIFICATION TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Alberts, Ronald)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Lawrence Branco. (Wilkins, James)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 28 DAYS by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Alberts, Ronald)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lawrence, A)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from FRESNO SUPERIOR COURT, case number 23CECG04239 by lawrence Branco. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11192379) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Interrested Parties, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vaknin, Hela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branco v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Branco
Represented By: James Hugh Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Hela Vaknin
Represented By: Ronald K. Alberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?