(SS) Moore v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Zachery John Moore
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2023cv01640
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: No District Court Judge
Referring Judge: Christopher D Baker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Becia, Franco)
December 4, 2023 Filing 10 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Franco Becia, GOVT for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Social Security Admin- SS E-Service and US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service terminated (Becia, Franco)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the elevation of U.S. District Judge Ana I. de Alba to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, the court finds it necessary to temporarily reassign this case to No District Court Judge (NODJ) until a new district judge is appointed. (Xiong, J.)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to No District Court Judge and Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. The new case number is: 1:23-cv-01640-NODJ-CDB (SS). (Xiong, J.)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Summons, #1 Social Security Complaint, #5 Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider served on AUSA and Commissioner of Social Security. (Maldonado, C)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 2/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *2440 Tulare St.* *Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Maldonado, C)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directing Clerk of Court to Issue Summons, Scheduling Order, and Consent or Request for Reassignment Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 11/27/2023. (Maldonado, C)
November 27, 2023 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Maldonado, C)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Zachery John Moore. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Zachery John Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Moore v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachery John Moore
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Franco Becia, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?