(HC) Gamboa v. Department of Human Services Child Services
Petitioner: David Gamboa
Respondent: Department of Human Services Child Services
Case Number: 1:2023cv01647
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Petition Should not be Dismissed signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/11/2023. Show Cause Response due within 30 days. (Xiong, J.)
December 12, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order to Show Cause served on David Gamboa. (Xiong, J.)
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to David Gamboa signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/27/2023. (Flores, E)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 1/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Flores, E)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Department of Human Services Child Services by David Gamboa.(Flores, E)
November 27, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #3 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on David Gamboa. (Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Gamboa v. Department of Human Services Child Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Human Services Child Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?