Estate of Tomi Kartchner et al v. County of Merced et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Tomi Kartchner, S. B., Kerry Calvert and Aaron Kartchner
Defendant: County of Merced, Merced County Sheriff's Office, Vernon Warnke, California Forensic Medical Group Doing business as Wellpath, Saetern Kao, Teresa Olvera and Dylan Fulcher
Case Number: 1:2023cv01672
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: No District Court Judge
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time for Defs. to File Their Response to the Complaint by California Forensic Medical Group, Dylan Fulcher, Saetern Kao. Attorney Romano, Lindsey Mack added. (Romano, Lindsey)
January 24, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to California Forensic Medical Group on 12/4/2023, Answer due 2/2/2024; Dylan Fulcher on 12/4/2023, Answer due 2/2/2024; Saetern Kao on 12/4/2023, Answer due 2/2/2024 (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service, #2 Waiver of Service)(Merin, Mark)
December 29, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to County of Merced on 12/4/2023, Answer due 2/2/2024; Merced County Sheriff's Office on 12/4/2023, Answer due 2/2/2024; Vernon Warnke on 12/4/2023, Answer due 2/2/2024 (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service, #2 Waiver of Service)(Merin, Mark)
December 4, 2023 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11219211. (Merin, Mark)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by S. B.: Amended #5 Notice - Other. (Merin, Mark)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Adequate Representation for Minor by S. B.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Borges Jr.)(Merin, Mark)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Order Reassigning NODJ, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Xiong, J.)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Merced County Sheriff's Office, Teresa Olvera, Vernon Warnke* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark E. Merin* *Law Office of Mark E. Merin* *1010 F Street, Suite 300* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Xiong, J.)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Forensic Medical Group, County of Merced, Dylan Fulcher, Saetern Kao* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark E. Merin* *Law Office of Mark E. Merin* *1010 F Street, Suite 300* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Xiong, J.)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against California Forensic Medical Group dba Wellpath, County of Merced, Dylan Fulcher, Saetern Kao, Merced County Sheriff's Office, Teresa Olvera, Vernon Warnke by Kerry Calvert, S. B., Estate of Tomi Kartchner, Aaron Kartchner. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-11214847-refunded 12/08/2023) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan Borges Jr., #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merin, Mark) Modified on 1/29/2024 (Singh, Romeeta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Tomi Kartchner et al v. County of Merced et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Tomi Kartchner
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. B.
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Calvert
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Kartchner
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Merced
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merced County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Warnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group Doing business as Wellpath
Represented By: Lindsey Mack Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saetern Kao
Represented By: Lindsey Mack Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Olvera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Fulcher
Represented By: Lindsey Mack Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?