Alvarez v. Morris-Shea Bridge Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sergio Alvarez
Defendant: Morris-Shea Bridge Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01725
Filed: December 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Morris-Shea Bridge Company, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wessels, Ryan)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE by Morris-Shea Bridge Company, Inc. to #6 Objections. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Idrian Mollaneda, #2 Proof of Service)(Wessels, Ryan)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The motion to dismiss (Doc. #4 ) is referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the preparation of findings and recommendations signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on January 5, 2024. (Munoz, I)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Minute Order served on Sergio Alvarez. (Munoz, I)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OBJECTIONS to Removal of Case From State Court, by Plaintiff Sergio Alvarez. (Marrujo, C)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Maldonado, C)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS by Morris-Shea Bridge Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Idrian Mollaneda, #3 Proof of Service)(Wessels, Ryan)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Informational Order) (Lundstrom, T)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Morris-Shea Bridge Company, Inc.. (Wessels, Ryan)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior Court, case number 23CECG04520 by Sergio Alvarez. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11244555) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proof of Service)(Wessels, Ryan)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Civil New Case Documents for JLT served on Sergio Alvarez. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. Morris-Shea Bridge Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris-Shea Bridge Company, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Dexter
Represented By: Idrian Mollaneda
Represented By: Ryan Wessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?