Carter v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Carter
Defendant: Vicent Petrescu, Willard L. Jackson, Nicole T Birch, Vincent Petrescu, 420 Real Estate, LLC, Trucrowd Inc a Delaware corporation doing business in the state of California Doing business as Fundanna, Transatlantic Real Estate, LLC, Bangi Inc and Robert S. Shumake
Case Number: 1:2023cv01775
Filed: December 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Vicent Petrescu. (Lawrence, A)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jeffrey Carter.(Bell, Anthony)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Robert S. Shumake* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony Bell* *Superheroes At Law, P.C.* *8383 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 935* *Beverly Hills, CA 90211*. (Marrujo, C)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jeffrey Carter.(Bell, Anthony)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/9/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A(m), #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Flores, E)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *420 Real Estate, LLC, Bangi Inc, Nicole T Birch, Willard L. Jackson, Vicent Petrescu, Transatlantic Real Estate, LLC, Trucrowd Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony Bell* *Superheroes At Law, P.C.* *8383 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 935* *Beverly Hills, CA 90211*. (Flores, E)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jeffrey Carter against All Defendants by Jeffrey Carter. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11261002) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bell, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicent Petrescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willard L. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole T Birch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Petrescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 420 Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trucrowd Inc a Delaware corporation doing business in the state of California Doing business as Fundanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transatlantic Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bangi Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Shumake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Carter
Represented By: Anthony Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?