(PC) Thomas v. Kern Valley State Prison Warden et al
Plaintiff: Larry Joseph Thomas
Defendant: Kern Valley State Prison Warden, M. Bowman, J. Argust and A. Sawtelle
Case Number: 1:2024cv00005
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING #8 Findings and Recommendations, Denying #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP, and Directing Plaintiff to Pay the Filing Fee Within 30 Days signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/9/2024. Filing Fee due within thirty (30) days. (Lawrence, A)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Larry Joseph Thomas. (Lawrence, A)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #8 by Plaintiff Larry Joseph Thomas. (Lawrence, A)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lawrence, A)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 01/08/2024. Referred to Judge Thurston; Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-Days. (Flores, E)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:24-cv-00005 JLT-BAM. (Flores, E)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Larry Joseph Thomas. (Flores, E)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Larry Joseph Thomas re Racial Justice Act. (Flores, E)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE Regarding Racial Justice Act by Larry Joseph Thomas. (Flores, E)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Larry Joseph Thomas. (Flores, E)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 2/5/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Marrujo, C)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Larry Joseph Thomas, CDCR No. J-05107 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Marrujo, C)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Larry Joseph Thomas. (Marrujo, C)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Larry Joseph Thomas. (Marrujo, C)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against J. Argust, M. Bowman, Kern Valley State Prison Warden, A. Sawtelle by Larry Joseph Thomas.(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Thomas v. Kern Valley State Prison Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Joseph Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern Valley State Prison Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Argust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Sawtelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?