(SS) Deleon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Arlene Deleon
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2024cv00007
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/8/2024: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 1:24-cv-00007-HBK.(Marrujo, C)
February 7, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Benavides, Francesco)
February 7, 2024 Filing 9 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #8 Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider, #1 Social Security Complaint, #7 Summons, #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on AUSA and Commissioner of Social Security. (Maldonado, C)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 5/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
February 7, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Francesco Paulo Benavides* *1990 N. California Blvd.* *Suite 20, PMB 1038* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596*. (Maldonado, C)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directing Clerk to Issue Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 02/06/2024. (Maldonado, C)
January 8, 2024 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Vieira, Christopher)
January 8, 2024 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Christopher Vieira for Commissioner of Social Security (Vieira, Christopher)
January 8, 2024 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Social Security Admin- SS E-Service and US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service terminated (Vieira, Christopher)
January 3, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Arlene Deleon. (Benavides, Francesco)
January 3, 2024 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Arlene Deleon. Attorney Benavides, Francesco Paulo added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benavides, Francesco)
January 3, 2024 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Lawrence, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Deleon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Deleon
Represented By: Francesco Paulo Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: Christopher Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?