Maldonado et al v. City of Fresno et al
Plaintiff: Marissa Maldonado, U. C., S. D., E. D. M., E. R. M., E. K. M. and O. S.
Defendant: City of Fresno, R. Harrell, E. Clairborne, Anthony Jeff, Alice Valenzuela and Paco Balderrama
Case Number: 1:2024cv00102
Filed: January 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of ERRATA by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,.. (Little, Kevin)
February 27, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Lynn L. Carpenter on behalf of Paco Balderrama, City of Fresno. Attorney Carpenter, Lynn L. added. (Carpenter, Lynn)
February 26, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Paco Balderrama, City of Fresno. Attorney O'Linn, Mildred K. added.(O'Linn, Mildred)
February 20, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: City of Fresno served on 2/5/2024, answer due 2/26/2024. (Little, Kevin)
January 23, 2024 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A(m), #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
January 23, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Paco Balderrama, City of Fresno, E. Clairborne, R. Harrell, Anthony Jeff, Alice Valenzuela* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin G. Little* *Law Office of Kevin G. Little* *P.O. Box 8656* *Fresno, CA 93747*. (Maldonado, C)
January 22, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by U. C., S. D., E. D. M., E. R. M., E. K. M., Marissa Maldonado, O. S. (Little, Kevin)
January 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND WRONGFUL DEATH against All Defendants by E. D. M., U. C., O. S., E. R. M., S. D., Marissa Maldonado, E. K. M.. Attorney Little, Kevin G added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11304642) (Little, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado et al v. City of Fresno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Maldonado
Represented By: Kevin G. Little
Represented By: Michelle Letricia Tostenrude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U. C.
Represented By: Michelle Letricia Tostenrude
Represented By: Kevin G. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. D.
Represented By: Kevin G. Little
Represented By: Michelle Letricia Tostenrude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. D. M.
Represented By: Michelle Letricia Tostenrude
Represented By: Kevin G. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. R. M.
Represented By: Kevin G. Little
Represented By: Michelle Letricia Tostenrude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. K. M.
Represented By: Kevin G. Little
Represented By: Michelle Letricia Tostenrude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O. S.
Represented By: Kevin G. Little
Represented By: Michelle Letricia Tostenrude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fresno
Represented By: Mildred K. O'Linn
Represented By: Lynn L. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Clairborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Jeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paco Balderrama
Represented By: Mildred K. O'Linn
Represented By: Lynn L. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?